Lubow v. Home Market Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott Lubow
Defendant: Home Market Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv02301
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/7/2021.(MSK)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 8/12/2021. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 8/9/2021. Settlement Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/4/2021.(MSK)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 2/28/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 10/4/2021. Motions (disp) due by 4/28/2022. Ready for trial due by 8/29/2022. Status Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/4/2021.(MSK)
December 30, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Scott Lubow. Jointly Signed by Scott Lubow and Home Market Foods, Inc.. (Olson, Daniel)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on Motion to Seal and on Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/29/2020. (MSK)
December 21, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/21/2020. (MSK)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Home Market Foods, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Scott Lubow.(Krummen, Craig)
December 7, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List, #9 Declaration in Support, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Home Market Foods, Inc.. (Krummen, Craig)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to SEAL #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List - Unredacted Complaint filed by Scott Lubow.(Olson, Daniel)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Home Market Foods, Inc.. (Krummen, Craig)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Home Market Foods, Inc.. (Krummen, Craig)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Home Market Foods, Inc. re #2 Exhibit, #11 Proposed Order to Judge, #8 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List, #10 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #9 Declaration in Support, #5 MOTION to SEAL #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List - Unredacted Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 4 Notice of Initial Case Assignment (Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to SEAL #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List - Unredacted Complaint filed by Home Market Foods, Inc..(Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #9 Sealed Document(s) - #9 Sealed Declaration in Support and [9-1] Sealed Exhibit A, [9-2] Sealed Exhibit B, [9-3] Sealed Exhibit C, and [9-4] Sealed Exhibit D filed by Home Market Foods, Inc..(Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED Declaration of Michael Weiermiller in Support of #5 MOTION to SEAL #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List - Unredacted Complaint filed by Home Market Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit D)(Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #7 Sealed Document(s) - #7 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal Unredacted Complaint, Memorandum in Support and Declaration filed by Home Market Foods, Inc..(Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to SEAL #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List - Unredacted Complaint filed by Home Market Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to SEAL #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List - Unredacted Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to SEAL #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List - Unredacted Complaint filed by Home Market Foods, Inc.. (Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-2301 (MJD/BRT). (MMP)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Redacted Document re #2 Sealed Complaint, filed by Home Market Foods, Inc. (Krummen, Craig) Modified text on 11/9/2020 (MMP).
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 - Unredacted Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Home Market Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Krummen, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8207248) filed by Home Market Foods, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons , #2 Redacted Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Krummen, Craig) Modified text on 11/9/2020 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lubow v. Home Market Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Market Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany A Blofield
Represented By: Craig S Krummen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lubow
Represented By: Daniel R Olson
Represented By: Jessica L. Kometz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?