Wolf v. Michels Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Keith Wolf
Defendant: Adrian R. Mattson and Michels Corporation
Case Number: 0:2020cv02328
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Keith Wolf. Adrian R. Mattson waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021; Michels Corporation waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Kestner, Peter)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet G Stellpflug on behalf of Adrian R. Mattson, Michels Corporation. (Stellpflug, Janet)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew R Young for Keith Wolf; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney D. J. Young, III for Keith Wolf. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/3/2020. (NAH)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney D.J. Young, III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8269526 filed by Keith Wolf. (Kestner, Peter)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew R. Young. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8269484 filed by Keith Wolf. (Kestner, Peter)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adrian R. Mattson, Michels Corporation. (lmb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-2328 (ECT/HB). (lmb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michels Corporation, Adrian R. Mattson (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-8223851) filed by Keith Wolf. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kestner, Peter) Modified text on 11/16/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Michels Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian R. Mattson
Represented By: John F Thomas
Represented By: Janet G Stellpflug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michels Corporation
Represented By: John F Thomas
Represented By: Janet G Stellpflug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Wolf
Represented By: Peter J Kestner
Represented By: D. J. Young, III
Represented By: Andrew R Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?