Coward v. Optum Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rex Coward
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc., Optum Care, Inc., OptumRX, Inc. and Optum Care Services Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv02331
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 12/14/2020.(LLM)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Rex Coward of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Consent of Ana De La Rosa, #2 Exhibit(s) Consent of Jenny Rodriguez, #3 Exhibit(s) Consent of Katrina Trejo, #4 Exhibit(s) Consent of Sadie Woods)(Alexander, William)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William Clifton Alexander for Rex Coward; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Austin Winters Anderson for Rex Coward; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Carter Tilden Hastings for Rex Coward. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/17/2020. (NAH)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Optum Care Services Company, Optum Care, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., OptumRX, Inc. (MKB)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-2331 (PAM/DTS). (MKB)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carter Hastings. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8225024 filed by Rex Coward. (Newville, Joshua)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Austin Anderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8224996 filed by Rex Coward. (Newville, Joshua)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Clif Alexander. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8224958 filed by Rex Coward. (Newville, Joshua)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8224920) filed by Rex Coward. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Newville, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coward v. Optum Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Care Services Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Coward
Represented By: Joshua A Newville
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter Tilden Hastings
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?