Piva v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Susan J Piva
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 0:2020cv02344
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/25/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright.The parties may jointly request that no pretrial conference be held and that the pretrial scheduling order be issued based on the Rule 26(f) Report and confidential settlement letters. The joint request should be emailed along with the copy of the Rule 26(f) Report in Word format to Magistrate Judge Wright at magistrate_wright_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Susan J Piva re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Lyon, Nicolet)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (KNK)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-2344 (NEB/ECW). (KNK)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8231691) filed by Susan J Piva. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyon, Nicolet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piva v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan J Piva
Represented By: Katherine L MacKinnon
Represented By: Nicolet Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?