Borgen v. Patch Boys Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Borgen
Defendant: Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, Leiby Goldberger and William Weber
Case Number: 0:2020cv02364
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION re: ESI Discovery Plan by Michael Borgen. Jointly Signed by All Defendants. (Borgen, Michael) Modified text on 3/12/2021 (CLK).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 9/27/2021. Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/23/2021. (HAM)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2021. Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 2/15/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 12/1/2021. Motions (disp) due by 5/1/2022. Ready for trial due by 9/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/24/2021. (HAM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Michael Borgen.(Borgen, Michael)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Michael Borgen.(Borgen, Michael)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Michael Borgen is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Michael Borgen has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service forms filed by Michael Borgen. (KNK) Document QC'd on 3/1/2021 (CLK).
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE To Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Counterclaim filed by Michael Borgen.(KNK)Document QC'd on 3/1/2021 (CLK).
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f) TO FACILITATE ISSUANCE OF RULE 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/28/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Borgen. filed by Curtis Swanson, Leiby Goldberger, Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, William Weber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Gray, Michael)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until January 11, 2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/22/2020. (HAM)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Leiby Goldberger, Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, William Weber.(Gray, Michael)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Leiby Goldberger, Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, William Weber. (Gray, Michael)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Gray on behalf of Leiby Goldberger, Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, William Weber. (Gray, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Leiby Goldberger, Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, William Weber. cc: Michael Borgen w/ Information Sheet. (JGK)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leiby Goldberger, Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, William Weber (filing fee $400, receipt number 3-1016095) filed by Michael Borgen. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borgen v. Patch Boys Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patch Boys Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Michael R Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Swanson
Represented By: Michael R Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leiby Goldberger
Represented By: Michael R Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Weber
Represented By: Michael R Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Borgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?