Siruk et al v. State of Minnesota (City of Elk River) et al
Plaintiff: Petro Siruk and Marina Siruk
Defendant: Chad Hennum, Eric Holmquist, Nabil Gubash, Brian Thorstad, State of Minnesota (City of Elk River), Ken Hanson, Ben Zawacki, Jeffrey Bednarek, Daniel Andren, Don Starry, Christopher Flaten and Mary Yunker
Case Number: 0:2020cv02373
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION AND OBJECTION TO CITY OF ELK RIVER' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Marina Siruk, Petro Siruk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Minnesota (City of Elk River) re #8 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Tsai, Evan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #4 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Tsai, Evan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Evan C. Tsai in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Minnesota (City of Elk River). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-11)(Tsai, Evan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Minnesota (City of Elk River). (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tsai, Evan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2021 at 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Tsai, Evan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Minnesota (City of Elk River). (Tsai, Evan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Marina Siruk, Petro Siruk. (NAH) QC'd on 1/14/2021 (NAH).
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Andren, Jeffrey Bednarek, Christopher Flaten, Nabil Gubash, Ken Hanson, Chad Hennum, Eric Holmquist, Don Starry, State of Minnesota (City of Elk River), Brian Thorstad, Mary Yunker, Ben Zawacki filed by Marina Siruk, Petro Siruk. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (NAH) QC'd on 1/14/2021 (NAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siruk et al v. State of Minnesota (City of Elk River) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Hennum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holmquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabil Gubash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Thorstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota (City of Elk River)
Represented By: Evan Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Zawacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bednarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Andren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Starry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Flaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Yunker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petro Siruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Siruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?