Piller-Pauna v. United States, The
Plaintiff: Sarah Piller-Pauna
Defendant: The United States and United States, The
Case Number: 0:2020cv02384
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G Brooker on behalf of United States, The. (Brooker, Gregory)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 12/14/2020.(LLM)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The United States. (KNK)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 6th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-2384 (PAM/LIB). (KNK)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States, The (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8251414) filed by Sarah Piller-Pauna. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hazelton, Gary) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piller-Pauna v. United States, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States, The
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Piller-Pauna
Represented By: Gary M Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?