National Liability & Fire Insurance Company v. Otis Elevator Company
Plaintiff: National Liability & Fire Insurance Company doing business as Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Ins. Co.
Defendant: Otis Elevator Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv02393
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: The Pretrial Conference that was scheduled for January 22, 2021 is CANCELLED. The parties report they have reached a settlement and dismissal paperwork will be forthcoming. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/13/2021.(TMA)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas T. Protentis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8344184 filed by National Liability & Fire Insurance Company. (Micheletti, Kelly) Modified text on 1/20/2021 (NAH).
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/15/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Sever, Stacey)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Otis Elevator Company response due 12/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/2/2020.(TMA)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Sever, Stacey)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #5 Stipulation AMENDED Allowing Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint Until 12/08/2020 by Otis Elevator Company. (Sever, Stacey)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Otis Elevator Company response due 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/30/2020.(TMA)
November 27, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re STIPULATION ALLOWING DEFENDANT OTIS ELEVATOR TO ANSWER OR OTHEWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #5 Stipulation. (Sever, Stacey)
November 27, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION ALLOWING DEFENDANT OTIS ELEVATOR TO ANSWER OR OTHEWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (UNTIL 12/01/2020) by Otis Elevator Company. (Sever, Stacey)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Thomas Baker as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-2393 ECT/ECW. (CLK)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is a corporate parent to report for Defendant Otis Elevator Company. (Sever, Stacey) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (kt).
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number None (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8255847) filed by Otis Elevator Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Notice of Removal - Ramsey Co., #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Sever, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Liability & Fire Insurance Company v. Otis Elevator Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Elevator Company
Represented By: Stacey L Sever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Liability & Fire Insurance Company doing business as Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Ins. Co.
Represented By: Kelly B Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?