Thompson v. Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The
Plaintiff: Emily Thompson
Defendant: Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The
Case Number: 0:2020cv02426
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 6/17/2021. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 6/11/2021. Settlement Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/7/2021.(MSK)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2021. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Expert Discovery due by 10/29/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 6/30/2021. Motions (disp) due by 12/29/2021. Ready for trial due by 5/2/2022. Telephone Conference set for 5/18/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/7/2021.(MSK)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/7/2021.(MSK)
January 6, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2021. (MSK)
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint filed by Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The. (Scott, Aaron)
December 31, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The. Jointly Signed by Emily Thompson. (Scott, Aaron)
December 31, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The. Jointly Signed by Emily Thompson.(Scott, Aaron)
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Emily Thompson. (Niesen, Andrea)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The. filed by Emily Thompson. No summons requested. (Niesen, Andrea)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/9/2020.(MSK)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION by Emily Thompson. Jointly Signed by The Waters Senior Living Managment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Niesen, Andrea)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. WILL REFILE STIPULATION. AMENDED COMPLAINT against Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The. filed by Emily Thompson. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Amend Complaint) (Niesen, Andrea) Modified text on 12/8/2020 (CLK).
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. AMENDED COMPLAINT against Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The. filed by Emily Thompson. No summons requested. (Niesen, Andrea) Modified text on 12/8/2020 (CLK).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-02426 ECT/BRT. (MTP)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant The Waters Senior Living Management, LLC. (Scott, Aaron)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Waters Senior Living Management, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Scott, Aaron)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Minnesota District Court, Third Judicial District, Olmsted County, case number not filed (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8266802) filed by The Waters Senior Living Management, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Scott, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waters Senior Living Management, LLC, The
Represented By: Aaron Mills Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Thompson
Represented By: Andrea B Niesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?