Klingelhutz et al v. Security Acquisitions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John D. Klingelhutz and Durene D. Klingelhutz
Defendant: Landmark Acquisition, LLC and Security Acquisitions, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv02479
Filed: December 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez is CANCELED. See Minutes dated 1/14/2021 for details. (KAT)
January 14, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 1/14/2021. See Minutes for details. (KAT)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/12/2021.(KAT)
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 1/12/2021. See Minutes for details. (KAT)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 02:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/8/2021.(KAT)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Durene D. Klingelhutz, John D. Klingelhutz . (Steinhoff, Patrick)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Durene D. Klingelhutz, John D. Klingelhutz.(Steinhoff, Patrick)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Patrick B. Steinhoff in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Durene D. Klingelhutz, John D. Klingelhutz.(Steinhoff, Patrick)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Durene D. Klingelhutz. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Steinhoff, Patrick)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION . Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S. Doty. (Steinhoff, Patrick) Modified text on 12/28/2020 (MMP).
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Durene D. Klingelhutz. ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance, #4 Declaration of Patrick B. Steinhoff with Exhibits, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion)(Steinhoff, Patrick) Modified text on 12/28/2020 (MKB).
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiffs' REPLY to Counterclaim filed by John D. Klingelhutz. (Steinhoff, Patrick)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B Steinhoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Steinhoff, Patrick)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST Plaintiffs against All Defendants. filed by Landmark Acquisition, LLC, Security Acquisitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) WEBBER DEED TO KLINGELHUTZ, #2 Exhibit(s) FED 29 2012 QUIT CLAIM DEED, #3 Exhibit(s) 2009 QUIT CLAIM DEED KLINGELHUTZ DEV TO KLINGELHUTZ) (Elliott, Christopher)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. The Court will email call-in instructions to counsel separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (BJP)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Landmark Acquisition, LLC, Security Acquisitions, LLC Notice of Removal Filed With Carver County District Court (Elliott, Christopher)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2479 (DSD/KMM). (lmb)
December 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Verified from Carver County District Court, case number 10-CV-20-866 (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8281894) filed by Landmark Acquisition, LLC, Security Acquisitions, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Elliott, Christopher) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klingelhutz et al v. Security Acquisitions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Klingelhutz
Represented By: Phillip R. Krass
Represented By: Patrick B Steinhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durene D. Klingelhutz
Represented By: Phillip R. Krass
Represented By: Patrick B Steinhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Arlen Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Arlen Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?