Lawrence v. Kallis
Petitioner: Troy Alan Lawrence
Respondent: Steve Kallis
Case Number: 0:2020cv02508
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Kallis re #6 Declaration, #5 Response, #7 Exhibit, #8 Statement instead of Redacted Document (Blumenfield, Chad)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #7 Sealed Document(s) - #7 Sealed Exhibit D . (Blumenfield, Chad)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED EXHIBIT D re #6 Declaration by Respondent. (Blumenfield, Chad)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Shannon Boldt re #5 Response by Steve Kallis . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G)(Blumenfield, Chad)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Steve Kallis.(Blumenfield, Chad)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of Steve Kallis. (Blumenfield, Chad)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Petitioner Troy Alan Lawrence, within 30 days of this Orders date, certifying the true cause and proper duration of Lawrence's confinement and showing cause why the writ should not be granted in this case. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/14/2020. (KAT)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 44641109418) filed by Troy Alan Lawrence. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Kallis
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy Alan Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?