Lawrence v. Clow Stamping Company
Plaintiff: Julie Lawrence
Defendant: Clow Stamping Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv02536
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 12/1/2021. Motions (disp) due by 1/1/2022. Ready for trial due by 5/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/4/2021.(JLB)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Clow Stamping Company. (Andreen, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Clow Stamping Company. Jointly Signed by Julie Lawrence.(Andreen, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Julie Lawrence. (Lammers, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-02536 MJD/LIB. (MTP)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Clow Stamping Company. (Andreen, James)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Crow Wing County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8309966) filed by Clow Stamping Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Andreen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Clow Stamping Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Lawrence
Represented By: Scott A Kruger
Represented By: Michael Lammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clow Stamping Company
Represented By: James R Andreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?