Clark et al v. Saul et al
Plaintiff: Shilitha Clark and Rikilah Clark
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv02585
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) Notice to Parties: On 01/05/2021, the clerk's office prepared and sent the service packets to the U.S. Marshal Service for service of process per #4 Order. Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (lmb)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. (KDS)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/4/2021. (TJB)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (NAH)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Rikilah Clark, Shilitha Clark. (NAH) Document QC'd by JME on 12/29/2020 (JME).
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul filed by Shilitha Clark, Rikilah Clark. Case assigned to Judge David T. Schultz per Social Security list list. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd by JME on 12/29/2020 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Saul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shilitha Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rikilah Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?