Walters v. TCF National Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Eileen Walters
Defendant: TCF National Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2021 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF National Bank, N.A. Motion taken under advisement, written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (CLG)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 Reply to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF National Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 Declaration of Kimberly Zillig in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Eileen Walters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Zillig, Kimberly)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Eileen Walters. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zillig, Kimberly)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Due to the pending motion to dismiss, there is good cause to delay setting a Rule 16 Conference at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/12/2021.(MSK)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Raiter, Shawn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF National Bank, N.A..(Raiter, Shawn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Shawn M. Raiter in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF National Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Raiter, Shawn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF National Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by TCF National Bank, N.A..(Raiter, Shawn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Raiter, Shawn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF National Bank, N.A.. (Raiter, Shawn)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant TCF National Bank, N.A.. (Raiter, Shawn)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-04 (PJS/BRT). (KNK)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8359732) filed by TCF National Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Raiter, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. TCF National Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF National Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Walters
Represented By: Kimberly S Moen Zillig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?