Summers v. TCF National Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: John Summers
Defendant: TCF National Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00075
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz is CANCELLED. (TJB)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by TCF National Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by John Summers.(Raiter, Shawn)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/2/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/2/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(TJB)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by TCF National Bank, N.A.. (Raiter, Shawn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant TCF National Bank, N.A.. (Raiter, Shawn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-75 DSD/DTS. (kt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8378756) filed by TCF National Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Raiter, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers v. TCF National Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF National Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Summers
Represented By: Kimberly S Moen Zillig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?