Kahring v. Dominium Management Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jill Kahring
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP and Dominium Management Services, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00077
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Joint ANSWER to Complaint filed by Dominium Management Services, LLC. (Kalla, Christopher)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Kahring. St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Kahring. Dominium Management Services, LLC served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dominium Management Services, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP. (CLK)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-77 PJS/KMM. (CLK)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dominium Management Services, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8378958) filed by Jill Kahring. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Michenfelder, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kahring v. Dominium Management Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP
Represented By: Douglass E Turner
Represented By: Christopher T Kalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Douglass E Turner
Represented By: Christopher T Kalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Kahring
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?