Busch-Harrison v. Dart Transit Company
Plaintiff: Angela Busch-Harrison
Defendant: Dart Transit Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv00119
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. That all of Plaintiff's claims against Defendant in the above-captioned matter shall be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice without further costs, attorneys' fees or expenses awarded to any of the parties. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/16/2021.(GRR)
February 15, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Benkstein, Brian)
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dart Transit Company. Jointly Signed by Angela Busch-Harrison. (Benkstein, Brian)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 10:30 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/20/2021.(KAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2021: #1 Consent Form) (MMP).
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-119 MJD/KMM. (MMG)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Defendant ANSWER to Complaint filed by Dart Transit Company. (Benkstein, Brian)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court from First Judicial District of Minnesota, Dakota County, case number n/a (filing fee $ 402, receipt number BMNDC-8400033) filed by Dart Transit Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits to Notice of Removal, including Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Benkstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busch-Harrison v. Dart Transit Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Busch-Harrison
Represented By: Ryan H Ahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dart Transit Company
Represented By: Brian T. Benkstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?