Dekker et al v. Cenlar FSB et al
Plaintiff: Justin J. Dekker and Michelle K. Dekker
Defendant: Cenlar FSB, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00162
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #15 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Wells Fargo only are hereby dismissed, without costs, disbursements, or attorney's fees to either party. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/18/2021.(GRR)
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Goolsby, John)
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendant Wells Fargo Only by Justin J. Dekker, Michelle K. Dekker. Jointly Signed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Goolsby, John)
March 17, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Justin J. Dekker, Michelle K. Dekker. Jointly Signed by Cenlar FSB, CitiMortgage, Inc., and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Goolsby, John)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/18/2021. (HAM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference is now set for 3/26/2021 at 11:00 AM, Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (HAM)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Cenlar FSB. (Sauer, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
January 30, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Johnson, Jenna)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CitiMortgage, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #6 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Appearance, #5 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #4 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Johnson, Jenna)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-162 MJD/TNL. (KDS)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, County of Hennepin, case number 27-cv-20-16886 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Cenlar Answer, #3 Exhibit(s) C-CMI Answer, #4 Exhibit(s) D-Notice of Judicial Assignment, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Jenna)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Johnson, Jenna) Modified text on 1/22/2021 (KDS). Modified text on 1/22/2021 (KDS).
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Johnson, Jenna)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Kathryn Johnson on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Johnson, Jenna)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Johnson, Jenna)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, County of Hennepin, case number 27-cv-20-16886 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8421973) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Cenlar Answer, #3 Exhibit(s) C-CMI Answer, #4 Exhibit(s) D-Notice of Judicial Assignment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Jenna) Modified text on 1/22/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dekker et al v. Cenlar FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Michael R Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jenna Kathryn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Jenna Kathryn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin J. Dekker
Represented By: John H Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle K. Dekker
Represented By: John H Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?