Widner v. Rademacher Companies, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Travis Widner
Defendant: Rademacher Companies, Inc. doing business as Bill's Superette doing business as Rademacher Family Partnership, LLLP, Rademacher Companies, Inc. doing business as Bill's Superette and Rademacher Family Partnership, LLLP
Case Number: 0:2021cv00289
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2021. Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 12/1/2021. Motions (disp) due by 2/1/2022. Ready for trial due by 5/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/2/2021. (HAM)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/2/2021. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Rademacher Companies, Inc., Rademacher Family Partnership, LLLP. Jointly Signed by Travis Widner, Rademacher Companies Inc, and Rademacher Family Partnership LL.(Steffenson, Mark)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/18/2021. (HAM)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rademacher Companies, Inc., Rademacher Family Partnership, LLLP. (Steffenson, Mark)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-289 (DSD/TNL). (lmb)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Rademacher Companies, Inc. (Steffenson, Mark) Modified text on 2/2/2021 (lmb).
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8457689) filed by Rademacher Companies, Inc., Rademacher Family Partnership, LLLP. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Steffenson, Mark) Modified text on 2/2/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Widner v. Rademacher Companies, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Widner
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rademacher Companies, Inc. doing business as Bill's Superette doing business as Rademacher Family Partnership, LLLP
Represented By: Mark V Steffenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rademacher Companies, Inc. doing business as Bill's Superette
Represented By: Mark V Steffenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rademacher Family Partnership, LLLP
Represented By: Mark V Steffenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?