Health Care Service Corporation, et al v. Albertsons Companies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BCBSM, Inc. (D/B/A Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota), Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company, HMO Minnesota (D/B/A Blue Plus), HMO Minnesota doing business as Blue Plus, BCBSM, Inc. doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota and Health Care Service Corporation
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc. and Supervalu, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00461
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE THAT NO REDACTION IS REQUIRED by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation re #92 Transcript,,,, . Attn: Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Liu, Shira)
June 14, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE THAT NO REDACTION IS REQUIRED by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., Supervalu, Inc. re #92 Transcript,,,, . Attn: Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Frakes, Aron)
June 6, 2021 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 5/20/2021 before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (76 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 6/14/2021. Redaction Request due 6/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (LAS)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #83 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number: 76; granting #85 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Numbers: 17, 20, 21, 61, 72; granting #87 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Numbers: 27, 30, 63, 74. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 6/22/2021 unless further timely submissions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/25/2021. (JEN)
May 24, 2021 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #82 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Liu, Shira)
May 24, 2021 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #82 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Frakes, Aron)
May 21, 2021 Filing 88 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #87 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #30 Exhibit, #63 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #74 Reply filed by Supervalu, Inc..(Huyser, Alethea)
May 21, 2021 Filing 87 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #30 Exhibit, #63 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #74 Reply filed by Supervalu, Inc.. (Huyser, Alethea)
May 21, 2021 Filing 86 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #85 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #61 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #72 Reply, #20 Exhibit, #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #21 Exhibit filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc..(Huyser, Alethea)
May 21, 2021 Filing 85 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #61 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #72 Reply, #20 Exhibit, #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #21 Exhibit filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc.. (Huyser, Alethea)
May 21, 2021 Filing 84 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #83 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #76 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation.(Liu, Shira)
May 21, 2021 Filing 83 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #76 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Liu, Shira)
May 20, 2021 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2021 re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Supervalu, Inc., #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., and #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Health Care Service Corporation, HMO Minnesota, BCBSM, Inc. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #80 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William L Roberts for Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., and for Supervalu, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/18/2021. (NAH)
May 13, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William L. Roberts. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8750227 filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., Supervalu, Inc.. (Frakes, Aron)
April 30, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation re #78 Declaration, Plaintiffs Request For Judicial Notice of Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration Of Shira Liu (Liu, Shira)
April 30, 2021 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Shira Liu re #76 Reply to Response to Motion, #77 Redacted Document by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Liu, Shira)
April 30, 2021 Filing 77 Redacted Document for #76 Reply Memorandum In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Remand filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Liu, Shira)
April 30, 2021 Filing 76 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Healthcare Service Corporation, BCBM, Inc., and HMO Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Liu, Shira)
April 30, 2021 Filing 75 Redacted Document for #74 Sealed Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant Supervalu, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Supervalu, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
April 30, 2021 Filing 74 SEALED REPLY re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Supervalu, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frakes, Aron)
April 30, 2021 Filing 73 Redacted Document for #72 Sealed Reply Memorandum In Support of Defendants Albertsons Companies, Inc. and Safeway Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
April 30, 2021 Filing 72 SEALED REPLY re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC and Safeway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frakes, Aron)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Count V of the Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/23/2021. (RJE)
April 19, 2021 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Aron J. Frakes in Opposition to #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Frakes, Aron)
April 19, 2021 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frakes, Aron)
April 19, 2021 Filing 68 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. WILL REFILE. MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., Supervalu, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frakes, Aron) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (CLK).
April 19, 2021 Filing 67 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Frakes, Aron)
April 19, 2021 Filing 66 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Frakes, Aron)
April 16, 2021 Filing 65 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Paul Mathis as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MTP)
April 16, 2021 Filing 64 Redacted Document for #63 Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendant Supervalu, Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation.(Liu, Shira)
April 16, 2021 Filing 63 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Health Care Service Corporation, BCBSM, Inc., and HMO Minnesota.(Liu, Shira)
April 16, 2021 Filing 62 Redacted Document for #61 Sealed Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Albertsons Companies, LLC And Safeway, Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) And 12(B)(6) filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation.(Liu, Shira)
April 16, 2021 Filing 61 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Plaintiffs Health Care Service Corporation, BCBSM, Inc., and HMO Minnesota.(Liu, Shira)
April 16, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Count V of the Complaint by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation (Liu, Shira) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (MKB).
April 16, 2021 Filing 59 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Liu, Shira)
April 16, 2021 Filing 58 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General: Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Frakes, Aron) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (lmb).
April 16, 2021 Filing 57 21-cv-00461AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General: Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Frakes, Aron) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (lmb).
April 14, 2021 Filing 56 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The Motions Hearing on #15 Motion to Dismiss, #25 Motion to Dismiss, and #44 Motion to Remand is rescheduled to 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(RJE)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiffs' letter request #54 seeking a modified briefing schedule as to Defendants' pending motions to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall respond to the pending motions to dismiss no later than April 16, 2021. Defendants shall reply to Plaintiffs' response no later than April 30, 2021. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/12/2021. (RJE)
April 12, 2021 Filing 54 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation . (Liu, Shira)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #52 Letter to Magistrate Judge. The Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/21 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Menendez and the related deadlines are CANCELED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/2/2021. (KAT)
April 1, 2021 Filing 52 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation . (Liu, Shira)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiffs' letter request #49 seeking a stay of the briefing and hearing schedule as to Defendants' pending motions to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs shall respond to the pending motions to dismiss no later than Monday, April 12, 2021. Defendants shall reply to Plaintiffs' response no later than Monday, April 26, 2021. The pending motions to dismiss shall be heard on May 14, 2021, together with Plaintiffs' pending motion to remand. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/23/2021. (RJE)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ian Logan for BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, and for Health Care Service Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/23/2021. (NAH)
March 22, 2021 Filing 49 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation requesting stay of the deadlines for all future briefing on Defendants Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 15, 25). (Liu, Shira)
March 22, 2021 Filing 48 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation.(Liu, Shira)
March 22, 2021 Filing 47 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #44 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation.(Liu, Shira)
March 22, 2021 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Liu, Shira)
March 22, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Liu, Shira)
March 22, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Liu, Shira)
March 22, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ian Logan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8615035 filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Moccio, Vincent)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #41 Letter to Magistrate Judge. The parties' letter request (ECF 41) to keep the unredacted complaint (ECF 2) under seal is GRANTED. The parties have sufficiently demonstrated, at this time, that the redacted information is properly kept confidential. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/10/2021.(JEN)
March 9, 2021 Filing 41 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation regarding continued sealing. (Moccio, Vincent)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kent Alan Gardiner for BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, and for Health Care Service Corporation; granting #37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kelly Hibbert for BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, and for Health Care Service Corporation; granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Shira Liu for BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, and for Health Care Service Corporation; granting #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen John McBrady for BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, and for Health Care Service Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/4/2021. (NAH)
March 2, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen J. McBrady. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8560397 filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Moccio, Vincent)
March 2, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shira Liu. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8560381 filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Moccio, Vincent)
March 2, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelly H. Hibbert. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8560368 filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Moccio, Vincent)
March 2, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kent A. Gardiner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8560344 filed by BCBSM, Inc., HMO Minnesota, Health Care Service Corporation. (Moccio, Vincent)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Laura G Hoey for Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., and for Supervalu, Inc.; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey J Bushofsky for Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., and for Supervalu, Inc.; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark A. Cianci for Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., and for Supervalu, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/1/2021. (NAH)
March 1, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., Supervalu, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura G. Hoey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8542596, #29 Declaration in Support, #19 Declaration in Support, #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark a. Cianci. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8542809, #21 Exhibit, #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #31 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #24 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #30 Exhibit, #26 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #33 Proposed Order to Judge, #22 Meet and Confer Statement, #32 Meet and Confer Statement, #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Redacted Document, #20 Exhibit, #28 Redacted Document, #23 Proposed Order to Judge, #13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey J. Bushofsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8542620 (Huyser, Alethea)
February 26, 2021 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Supervalu, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 32 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #25 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Supervalu, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 31 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #30 , #20 , #21 Sealed Document(s) - #20 Sealed Exhibit 1, #21 Sealed Exhibit 2, #30 Sealed Exhibit 1 filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., Supervalu, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 30 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #29 Declaration in Support filed by Supervalu, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 29 Declaration of Aron J. Frakes in Support of #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Supervalu, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 28 Redacted Document for #27 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Defendant Supervalu, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6) filed by Supervalu, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 27 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Supervalu, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Supervalu, Inc.. (Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Supervalu, Inc.. (Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 22 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 21 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #19 Declaration in Support filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC and Safeway, Inc.(Frakes, Aron) Modified text on 3/1/2021 (MKB).
February 26, 2021 Filing 20 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 re #19 Declaration in Support filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC and Safeway, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 Declaration of Aron J. Frakes in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 3, #2 Exhibit(s) 4, #3 Exhibit(s) 5)(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 Redacted Document for #17 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Albertsons Companies, Inc. and Safeway Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc..(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC and Safeway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc.. (Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark a. Cianci. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8542809 filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., Supervalu, Inc.. (Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey J. Bushofsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8542620 filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., Supervalu, Inc.. (Frakes, Aron)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura G. Hoey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8542596 filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc., Supervalu, Inc.. (Frakes, Aron)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2021 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-only) ORDER: The motion to seal #3 is provisionally granted. Counsel for the parties are directed to meet and confer within the next 14 days regarding the propriety of keeping the unredacted complaint under seal. On or before 3/9/2021, the parties shall advise the undersigned Magistrate Judge of the results of their discussions, including whether they have any disagreement about the confidentiality of the redacted portions of the complaint. If the parties agree that the unredacted complaint should remain under seal, they should so advise the court in a joint letter of no more than three pages, including citations to any relevant legal authority. If the parties disagree as to the proper treatment of the unredacted complaint, they shall set forth their positions in separate letters of no more than three pages, including citations to any relevant legal authority. These letters need not be filed on ECF, but if the parties prefer that they be part of the electronic record, they may do so. In any event, the parties' joint or separate letters must be sent to the undersigned Magistrate Judge at the following email address: menendez_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/24/2021. (BJP)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kent A. Gardiner, Stephen J. McBrady, Kelly H. Hibbert, Jeffrey J. Bushofsky, Laura G. Hoey, Mark A. Cianci, Elizabeth Tolon as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-461 (WMW/KMM). (MMP)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2 (Huyser, Alethea)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Safeway, Inc.. (Huyser, Alethea)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Albertsons Companies, LLC. (Huyser, Alethea)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to SEAL #2 Exhibit A, Part 2 filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc.. (Huyser, Alethea)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED State Court Complaint with Sealed Exhibit 1 re #1 Notice of Removal, by Albertsons Companies, LLC and Safeway, Inc. (Huyser, Alethea) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (lmb).
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 Redacted NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota-Dakota County District Court, case number 19HA-CV-21-213 (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8517267) filed by Albertsons Companies, LLC, Safeway, Inc. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Part 1 - Redacted Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Huyser, Alethea) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (MMP). Modified text on 2/22/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health Care Service Corporation, et al v. Albertsons Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, LLC
Represented By: Alethea M Huyser
Represented By: Mark A. Cianci
Represented By: Jeffrey J Bushofsky
Represented By: Laura G Hoey
Represented By: Pari McGarraugh
Represented By: Aron J Frakes
Represented By: William L Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: Alethea M Huyser
Represented By: Mark A. Cianci
Represented By: Jeffrey J Bushofsky
Represented By: Laura G Hoey
Represented By: Pari McGarraugh
Represented By: Aron J Frakes
Represented By: William L Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervalu, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Cianci
Represented By: Jeffrey J Bushofsky
Represented By: Laura G Hoey
Represented By: Alethea M Huyser
Represented By: Pari McGarraugh
Represented By: Aron J Frakes
Represented By: William L Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCBSM, Inc. (D/B/A Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO Minnesota (D/B/A Blue Plus)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO Minnesota doing business as Blue Plus
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Ian Logan
Represented By: Shira Liu
Represented By: Kelly Hibbert
Represented By: Vincent J Moccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCBSM, Inc. doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Ian Logan
Represented By: Shira Liu
Represented By: Kelly Hibbert
Represented By: Vincent J Moccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Ian Logan
Represented By: Shira Liu
Represented By: Kelly Hibbert
Represented By: Vincent J Moccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?