Stang v. Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joann P. Stang and Richard Stang
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv00612
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Owners Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Joanne Stang and Richard Stang.(Tillitt, R)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER - On April 20, 2021, the Defendant filed a letter [Docket No. #21 ] withdrawing their Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Count II [Docket No. #11 ], and requesting that the hearing, currently scheduled for May 26, 2021, be cancelled. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on the Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Count II [Docket No. #11 ], currently scheduled for May 26, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. via telephone is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/20/2021.(JLB)
April 20, 2021 Filing 21 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #11 MOTION to Strike Pleading #6 Errata Amended Complaint from Bradley L. Idelkope. (Idelkope, Bradley)
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Bad Faith Claim by Owners Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Joanne P. Stang and Richard Stang. (Idelkope, Bradley)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER: On April 9, 2021, the parties filed a letter #18 , requesting the hearing on the Defendant's Motion to Strike #11 , be held telephonically due to a conflict with Plaintiff's counsel. Based upon review of the files and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the hearing on the Motion to Strike #11 , currently set for 1:30 p.m. on May 26, 2021 in Duluth, Minnesota, will be held TELEPHONICALLY. The parties are directed to call Jennifer Beck, Courtroom Deputy, at (218) 529-3520 for dial-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/12/2021.Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(JLB)
April 9, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST Stipulated request that motion hearing be conducted via telephone by Joann P. Stang, Richard Stang. (Kirshbaum, James)
April 8, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Strike Pleading #6 Errata Amended Complaint filed by Owners Insurance Company.(Idelkope, Bradley)
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Strike Pleading filed by Owners Insurance Company.(Idelkope, Bradley)
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 Declaration of Bradley L. Idelkope in Support of #11 MOTION to Strike Pleading #6 Errata Amended Complaint filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Idelkope, Bradley)
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Strike Pleading #6 Errata Amended Complaint filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance)(Idelkope, Bradley)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #11 MOTION to Strike Pleading #6 Errata Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Idelkope, Bradley)
April 7, 2021 Filing 12 **DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT DATE LISTED - CONTACTED COUNSEL TO REFILE** NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Strike Pleading #6 Errata Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Idelkope, Bradley) Modified text on 4/8/2021 (JLB).
April 7, 2021 Filing 11 WITHDRAWN Per Letter #21 filed 4/20/2021. MOTION to Strike Pleading #6 Errata Amended Complaint filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Idelkope, Bradley) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (lmb).
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Tillitt, R)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Tillitt, R)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley L Idelkope on behalf of Auto Owners Insurance. (Idelkope, Bradley)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R Stephen Tillitt on behalf of All Defendants. (Tillitt, R)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 ERRATA Amended Complaint by Joann P. Stang, Richard Stang. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kirshbaum, James)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joann P. Stang, Richard Stang , AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joann P. Stang, Richard Stang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Kirshbaum, James)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Auto Owners Insurance. (KDS)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-612 NEB/LIB. (KDS)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Auto Owners Insurance filed by Joann P. Stang. (Kirshbaum, James)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auto Owners Insurance (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8564845) filed by Joann P. Stang. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirshbaum, James) Modified text on 3/3/2021 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stang v. Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann P. Stang
Represented By: James John Kirshbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stang
Represented By: James John Kirshbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley L Idelkope
Represented By: R Stephen Tillitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?