Canon Inc. v. Katun Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Canon Inc.
Defendant: Katun Corporation and General Plastic Industrial Co.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00655
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Canon Inc.. General Plastic Industrial Co. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Fowlkes, Christopher)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Canon Inc.. Katun Corporation waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Fowlkes, Christopher)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael P. Sandonato for Canon Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/15/2021. (NAH)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael P. Sandonato. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8585362 filed by Canon Inc.. (Fowlkes, Christopher)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Attachments: #1 Addendum)(Fowlkes, Christopher)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to General Plastic Industrial Co., Katun Corporation. (kt)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-655 NEB/TNL. (kt)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael P. Sandonato as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Canon Inc.. (Fowlkes, Christopher)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Canon Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8578150) filed by Canon Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fowlkes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canon Inc. v. Katun Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katun Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Plastic Industrial Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canon Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Fowlkes
Represented By: Michael P. Sandonato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?