Davis v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dale Davis
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company, Unum Life Insurance Company of America, Aspen Aerials, Inc. and Tick Tock Benefits, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00657
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jerilyn Jacobs for Tick Tock Benefits, LLC. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 4/26/2021. (NAH)
April 22, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jerilyn Jacobs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8698650 filed by Tick Tock Benefits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Keeler, William) Modified text on 4/22/2021 (CLK).
April 21, 2021 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #35 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Kersting, Edna)
April 21, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #35 MOTION to Dismiss/General pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Kersting, Edna)
April 21, 2021 Filing 37 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #35 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Principal Life Insurance Company.(Kersting, Edna)
April 21, 2021 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support re #35 MOTION to Dismiss/General pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Group Policy), #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kersting, Edna)
April 21, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss/General pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Kersting, Edna)
April 21, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Keeler, III on behalf of Tick Tock Benefits, LLC. (Attachments: FILED IN ERROR: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Keeler, William) Modified text on 4/22/2021 (MTP).
April 12, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Aspen Aerials, Inc.. (Torgerson, R)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edna S. Kersting for Principal Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 4/12/2021. (NAH)
April 8, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edna S. Kersting. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8670863 filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Loringer, John)
April 8, 2021 Filing 30 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Pleading to Complaint. (Loringer, John)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER on #27 Stipulation. Principal Life Insurance Company answer due 4/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/6/2021.(JLB)
April 6, 2021 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #27 Stipulation. (Loringer, John)
April 6, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Principal Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Dale Davis. (Loringer, John)
April 6, 2021 Filing 26 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Non-Compliance with #Local Rule 7.1 Civil Motion Practice for #20 Motion for Extension of Time (General) filed by attorney John P Loringer. No Meet & Confer Statement Filed. No Memorandum of Law Filed. No Notice of Hearing on Motion Filed. Supporting Documents not filed simultaneously with Motion. No Proposed Order filed in CM/ECF. Proposed Order not emailed to the Judge in word processing format. Please file according to the rule and contact the appropriate chambers if further direction is needed. (JLB)
April 5, 2021 Filing 25 BRIEF re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Pleading to Complaint filed by Principal Life Insurance Company.(Loringer, John)
April 5, 2021 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Pleading to Complaint filed by Dale Davis.(Balmer, Stephanie)
April 5, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Pleading to Complaint filed by Dale Davis. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Balmer, Stephanie)
April 5, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Stephanie M. Balmer in Opposition to #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Pleading to Complaint filed by Dale Davis.(Balmer, Stephanie)
April 5, 2021 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Aspen Aerials, Inc.. (Torgerson, R)
April 5, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Pleading to Complaint filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Loringer, John)
April 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Loringer on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company. (Loringer, John)
April 1, 2021 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tick Tock Benefits, LLC re #12 Notice of Appearance, #14 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #13 Answer to Complaint (Kirschner, Melissa)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND - 1. The parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond #9 is APPROVED; and 2. Defendant Aspen Aerials, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint by no later than April 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/30/2021.(JLB)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Tick Tock Benefits, LLC. (Kirschner, Melissa)
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Tick Tock Benefits, LLC. (Kirschner, Melissa)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Anne Kirschner on behalf of Tick Tock Benefits, LLC. (Kirschner, Melissa)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-CHAMBERS WILL REFILE. ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Aspen Aerials, Inc. answer due 4/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/29/2021.(JLB) Modified text on 3/30/2021 (MMG).
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Torgerson, R)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Aspen Aerials, Inc.. Jointly signed by Dale Davis. (Torgerson, R) Modified text on 3/29/2021 (MMG).
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by R Thomas Torgerson on behalf of Aspen Aerials, Inc.. (Torgerson, R)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Davis. Tick Tock Benefits, LLC served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Balmer, Stephanie)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Davis. Aspen Aerials, Inc. served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Balmer, Stephanie)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Davis. Unum Life Insurance Company of America served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Balmer, Stephanie)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Davis. Principal Life Insurance Company served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Balmer, Stephanie)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aspen Aerials, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company, Tick Tock Benefits, LLC, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (CLK)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-657 ECT/LIB. (CLK)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8578525) filed by Dale Davis. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Balmer, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Davis
Represented By: Stephanie M Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edna S. Kersting
Represented By: John P Loringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Aerials, Inc.
Represented By: R Thomas Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tick Tock Benefits, LLC
Represented By: Jerilyn Jacobs
Represented By: William E. Keeler, III
Represented By: Melissa Anne Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?