Mays v. Bloomington Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Defendant: Jane Doe, Bloomington Police Department, Caroylin Kne, Hennepin Adult Dention Center and John Doe
Case Number: 0:2021cv00665
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER in Response to #4 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Mays shall submit the required financial information by May 3, 2021. One copy of this order shall be mailed to the financial department at the institution where Mays is now confined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/6/2021. (GFK)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/4/21. (kt)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/16/2021.(JGS)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Otis Mays. (JGK) Document QC'd on 3/19/2021 (MMG).
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Bloomington Police Department, Jane Doe(Police Officer/Correction Officer; Hennepin County Adult Dention Center), Jane Doe(Police Officer; Bloomington Police Department (BPD)), Jane Doe(Nurse; Hennepin County Adult Dention Center), John Doe(Police Officer-Booking Officer; Bloomington Police Department (BPD)), John Doe(Police Officer/Correction; Hennepin County Adult Dention Center), John Doe(Police Officer/Transport Officer; Bloomington Police Department (BPD)), John Doe(Police Officer/Correction Officer; Hennepin County Adult Detention Center), John Doe(Police Officer - Correction; Hennepin County Adult Detention Center), John Doe(Police Officer; Bloomington Police Department (BPD)), Hennepin Adult Dention Center, Caroylin Kne filed by Otis Mays. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 3/19/2021 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Bloomington Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomington Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroylin Kne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin Adult Dention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?