United States of America v. $277,010.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $30,380.00 in U.S. Currency, $277,010.00 in U.S. Currency and Danielle Lyn Thompson
Claimant: Andrew Jerome Bigbee
Case Number: 0:2021cv00691
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #15 Stipulation, ORDER Staying Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/2/2021.(MSK)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Repka, Daniel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION to stay the civil forfeiture proceedings by Andrew Jerome Bigbee. Jointly Signed by Danielle Lyn Thompson and United States of America. (Repka, Daniel)
May 11, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re stipulation to extend time to file an answer. (Sarratori, Paul)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on Stipulation #12 . Andrew Jerome Bigbee answer due 6/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/11/2021.(MSK)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re stipulation to extend time to file an answer. (Repka, Daniel)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Jerome Bigbee re #6 Claim Verified (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Repka, Daniel)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 CLAIM OWNER filed by Danielle Lyn Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sarratori, Paul)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Andrew Jerome Bigbee. (Repka, Daniel)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul P Sarratori on behalf of Danielle Lyn Thompson. (Sarratori, Paul)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 CLAIM Verified filed by Andrew Jerome Bigbee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Claimants certificate of service on plaintiff)(Repka, Daniel)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul P Sarratori on behalf of Danielle Lyn Thompson. (Sarratori, Paul)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM Returned Executed on 3/18/2021 as to $277,010.00 and $$30,380.00 in U.S. Currency. (MMP)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (MMG)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-691 (PJS/BRT). (MMP)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $277,010.00 in U.S. Currency, $30,380.00 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hochhalter, Quinn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $277,010.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,380.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $277,010.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Lyn Thompson
Represented By: Paul P Sarratori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Quinn Hochhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Andrew Jerome Bigbee
Represented By: Daniel P Repka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?