Ballou et al v. Asset Marketing Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Joan Williamson and William Ballou
Defendant: Asset Marketing Services, LLC doing business as Govmint.com
Case Number: 0:2021cv00694
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mack H Reed on behalf of Asset Marketing Services, LLC. (Reed, Mack)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by William Ballou, Joan Williamson. Asset Marketing Services, LLC waiver sent on 3/19/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Steckler, Bruce)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bruce Steckler for William Ballou and for Joan Williamson; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Austin Paul Smith for William Ballou and for Joan Williamson. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/18/2021. (NAH)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Austin P. Smith. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8598543 filed by William Ballou, Joan Williamson. (Bleichner, Bryan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bruce W. Steckler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8598524 filed by William Ballou, Joan Williamson. (Bleichner, Bryan)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Bruce W. Steckler as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Asset Marketing Services, LLC. (KNK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-694 (SRN/ECW). (KNK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Asset Marketing Services, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8594309) filed by William Ballou, Joan Williamson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bleichner, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballou et al v. Asset Marketing Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Marketing Services, LLC doing business as Govmint.com
Represented By: Mack H Reed
Represented By: Stephen M Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Williamson
Represented By: Christopher P Renz
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Bores
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Bruce Steckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ballou
Represented By: Christopher P Renz
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Bores
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Bruce Steckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?