Campbell v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Vickey Campbell
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 0:2021cv00699
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/15/2021.(las)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vickey Campbell (Azbill, Morgan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 WITHDRAWAL of Claim filed by Vickey Campbell. (Azbill, Morgan)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Vickey Campbell (Azbill, Morgan)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (MMG)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-699 DWF/KMM. (MMG)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8595730) filed by Vickey Campbell. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Azbill, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickey Campbell
Represented By: Zachary Schmoll
Represented By: Morgan K. Azbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?