Laramore v. Quality Residence, LLC.
Plaintiff: Adrianne L. Laramore
Defendant: Quality Residence, LLC.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00781
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 24 OBJECTION re #23 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO filed by Adrianne L. Laramore. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter 1, #2 Cover Letter 2, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Envelope)(KDS) Document QC'd on 5/21/2021 (KDS).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 5/5/2021. (RJE)
April 23, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adrianne L. Laramore re #21 Memorandum, #19 Response, #20 Exhibits 1-6 (MMP)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's #19 Response to Defendant's Answer filed by Adrianne L. Laramore.(MMP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2021: #1 Cover Letter) (MMP). Document QC'd on 5/5/2021 (KDS).
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 EXHIBITS 1-6 filed by Adrianne L. Laramore.(MMP) Document QC'd on 5/5/2021 (KDS).
April 22, 2021 Filing 19 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to #18 Defendant's Answer to Complaint filed by Adrianne L. Laramore. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(MMP) Document QC'd on 5/5/2021 (KDS).
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint re #10 , [10-1] Amended Complaint filed by Quality Residence, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Conners, Ryan) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (MTP).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. Defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint by April 28, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/14/2021. (JEN)
April 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Quality Residence, LLC. re #10 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Conners, Ryan)
April 14, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Quality Residence, LLC. re #8 Answer to Complaint, #9 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #7 Notice of Appearance (Conners, Ryan)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be sent to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Adrianne L. Laramore. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd on 5/4/2021 (CLK).
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Quality Residence, LLC.. (Conners, Ryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Quality Residence, LLC.. (Conners, Ryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan T Conners on behalf of Quality Residence, LLC.. (Conners, Ryan)
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adrianne L. Laramore re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint, (MMP) Modified date filed on 5/4/2021 (CLK). Document QC'd on 5/4/2021 (CLK).
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Adrianne L. Laramore.(MMP) Modified date filed 5/4/21. Document QC'd on 5/4/2021 (CLK).
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Adrianne L. Laramore. (Attachments: #1 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope)(MMP) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (MTP). Modified date filed on 5/4/21. Document QC'd on 5/4/2021 (CLK).
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrianne L. Laramore. Quality Residence, LLC. served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (MMP) Document QC'd on 4/7/2021 (JGK).
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - Summons Issued as to Quality Residence, LLC. (MMP) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (MMP).
April 2, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION - DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - for #5 Summons Issued (MMP)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Katherine Menendez. (KAT)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Quality Residence, LLC.. cc: Adrianne L. Laramore w/ Information sheet. (JGK)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quality Residence, LLC. (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-0000088) filed by Adrianne L. Laramore. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/15/2021 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laramore v. Quality Residence, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianne L. Laramore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Residence, LLC.
Represented By: Ryan T Conners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?