Condair Group AG v. Dri-Steem Corporation
Plaintiff: Condair Group AG
Defendant: DRI-STEEM Corporation
Case Number: 0:2021cv00863
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Condair Group AG. Dri-Steem Corporation waiver sent on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Chadwick, Eric)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lawrence Jay Crain for Condair Group AG; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul Kitch for Condair Group AG; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Allyson Martin for Condair Group AG. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/9/2021. (NAH)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allyson M. Martin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8666398 filed by Condair Group AG. (Chadwick, Eric)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R. Kitch. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8666394 filed by Condair Group AG. (Chadwick, Eric)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lawrence J. Crain. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8666368 filed by Condair Group AG. (Chadwick, Eric)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Chadwick, Eric)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dri-Steem Corporation. (KNK)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Lawrence J. Crain, Paul R. Kitch, Allyson M. Martin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-863 (PJS/ECW). (KNK)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DRI-STEEM Corporation (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8642708) filed by Condair Group AG. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chadwick, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Condair Group AG v. Dri-Steem Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Condair Group AG
Represented By: Eric H Chadwick
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Crain
Represented By: Paul Kitch
Represented By: Allyson Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRI-STEEM Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?