Washington v. Titus
Petitioner: Keith Eugene Washington
Respondent: Jeff Titus
Case Number: 0:2021cv00921
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendation filed by Jeff Titus. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidt, Jonathan)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 OBJECTION TO #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Keith Eugene Washington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Qc'd on 5/21/2021 (KNK).
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 RECEIPT number 44641110560 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Keith Eugene Washington. (MMP) Qc'd on 5/7/2021 (KNK).
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #4 Request filed by Keith Eugene Washington. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/13/2021. (EB)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Schmidt on behalf of Jeff Titus. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidt, Jonathan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jeff Titus Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Frank, Matthew)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Keith Eugene Washington re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Washington (NAH)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 PETITIONER'S REQUEST PERMISSION TO FILE A SECOND HABEAS PETITION 28 U.S.C. 2244(b) (3)(A) filed by Keith Eugene Washington.(NAH) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/25/21. (kt)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #2 Declaration filed by Keith Eugene Washington.(NAH) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/25/21. (kt)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 PETITIONER'S DECLARATION FOR SUPPORT OF INEFFECTIVE ASSISTACE OF COUNSEL by Keith Eugene Washington. (NAH) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/25/21. (kt)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith Eugene Washington. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Order, #2 Envelope) (NAH) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/25/21. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Titus
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Jonathan P Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Eugene Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?