Widner v. Victory Village V. L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Travis Widner
Defendant: Victory Village V LLC and Victory Village V. L.L.C.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00967
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(lmb)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any of the parties. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/30/2021.(GRR)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Breyer, K)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Victory Village V. L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by Travis Widner. (Breyer, K)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-967 (MJD/TNL). (MKB)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Victory Village V. L.L.C. filed by Victory Village V. L.L.C.. (Breyer, K)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anoka County District Court (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8676434) filed by Victory Village V LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Breyer, K) Modified text on 4/13/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Widner v. Victory Village V. L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Widner
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory Village V LLC
Represented By: K Jon Breyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory Village V. L.L.C.
Represented By: K Jon Breyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?