Overcash v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tiffany Nicole Overcash
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2021cv01033
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. A notice to withdraw consent has been filed in this case and is now assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1033 WMW/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMG)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Wirmani on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Wirmani, Tracey)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 (Text-Only) Notice to Parties: The clerk's office has prepared and sent the service packets to the U.S. Marshal Service for service of process per #5 Order. Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (CLK)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (CLK)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/26/2021. (JLB)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (CLK)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois per Social Security List. Please use case number 21-cv-1033 LIB. (CLK)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Tiffany Nicole Overcash. (Greeman, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Tiffany Nicole Overcash. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greeman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overcash v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Tracey Wirmani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Nicole Overcash
Represented By: James H Greeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?