Stucki et al v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Stucki and Travis Tharpe
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv01085
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, re Extension of Time to Answer by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Richard Stucki, et at.,. (Krauss, Michael)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Krauss, Michael)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M Krauss on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Krauss, Michael)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Stucki, Travis Tharpe. Hyundai Motor America, Inc. served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Regan, Anne)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (kt)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1085 MJD/ECW. (kt)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8709367) filed by Richard Stucki, Travis Tharpe. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Regan, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stucki et al v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stucki
Represented By: Nathan D Prosser
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Brian William Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Tharpe
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Nathan D Prosser
Represented By: Brian William Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael M Krauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?