Omititi v. ResCare Minnesota, Inc.
Plaintiff: Omare Omititi
Defendant: ResCare Minnesota, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv01140
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 8/19/2021. Settlement Conference set for 8/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/25/2021.(TMA)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2021. Fact Discovery due by 1/28/2022. Expert Discovery due by 5/13/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 10/8/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 2/11/2022. Motions (disp) due by 6/13/2022. Ready for trial due by 10/13/2022. Status Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/25/2021.(MSK)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE based on Consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. NOTE: The new case number is 21-cv-1140 (BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 6/24/2021.(JRC) Modified text on 6/28/2021 (MTP).
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/23/2021. (MSK)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge with appeal to 8th Circuit. (Gilbertson, Britt)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by ResCare Minnesota, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Omare Omititi.(Gilbertson, Britt)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing, TIME CHANGE ONLY: The pretrial conference set for 06/23/2021 will begin at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson.(MSK)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by ResCare Minnesota, Inc.. (Louwagie, Samuel)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-1140 (DSD/BRT). (MKB)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by ResCare Minnesota, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Louwagie, Samuel)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant ResCare Minnesota, Inc.. (Louwagie, Samuel)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8720648) filed by ResCare Minnesota, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Louwagie, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omititi v. ResCare Minnesota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omare Omititi
Represented By: Scott A Kruger
Represented By: Michael Lammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ResCare Minnesota, Inc.
Represented By: Britt M Gilbertson
Represented By: Samuel N. Louwagie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?