Clauson v. Stride Academy
Plaintiff: Kayla Clauson
Defendant: Stride Academy
Case Number: 0:2021cv01141
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Stride Academy. (Vieira, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayla Clauson. Stride Academy served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Healey, Michael)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stride Academy. (MMP)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1141 (NEB/LIB). (MMP)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stride Academy (filing fee $ 402, receipt number BMNDC-8724390) filed by Kayla Clauson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Healey, Michael) Modified text on 5/4/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clauson v. Stride Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Clauson
Represented By: Michael B Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stride Academy
Represented By: Michael J. Ervin
Represented By: Elizabeth J Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?