Michelson, Jr. v. O'Driscoll, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas S Michelson, Jr. and Thomas S. Michelson, Jr.
Defendant: Shawn W. O'Driscoll, M.D. and Mayo Clinic
Case Number: 0:2021cv01166
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anupama D Sreekanth on behalf of Mayo Clinic, Shawn W. O'Driscoll, M.D.. (Sreekanth, Anupama)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory E Karpenko on behalf of Mayo Clinic, Shawn W. O'Driscoll, M.D.. (Karpenko, Gregory)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas S. Michelson, Jr.. Shawn W. O'Driscoll, M.D. waiver sent on 5/18/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Zellner, Kathleen)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas S. Michelson, Jr.. Mayo Clinic waiver sent on 5/18/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Zellner, Kathleen)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas M. Curran for Thomas S. Michelson, Jr..; granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathleen Zellner for Thomas S. Michelson, Jr.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/7/2021. (JGK)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic, Shawn W. O'Driscoll, M.D. (MTP)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-01166 MJD/KMM. (MTP)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas Curran. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8730350 filed by Thomas S Michelson, Jr.. (Storms, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathleen T. Zellner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8730344 filed by Thomas S Michelson, Jr.. (Storms, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8730275) filed by Thomas S Michelson, Jr.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Expert Review) (Storms, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelson, Jr. v. O'Driscoll, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn W. O'Driscoll, M.D.
Represented By: Gregory E Karpenko
Represented By: Anupama D Sreekanth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic
Represented By: Gregory E Karpenko
Represented By: Anupama D Sreekanth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S Michelson, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Storms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Michelson, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas M. Curran
Represented By: Jeffrey S Storms
Represented By: Kathleen Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?