SECURA Insurance Company v. Deere & Company
Plaintiff: SECURA Insurance Company and SECURA Insurance Company as subrogee of Lance Goettl doing business as TLG Farm Partnership
Defendant: Deere & Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01198
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 22 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. This matter may be Dismissed Without Prejudice. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/14/2021.(GRR)
June 10, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SECURA Insurance Company (Taylor, David)
June 8, 2021 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Plaintiff SECURA Insurance Company of SECURA Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent. (Taylor, David) Modified text on 6/8/2021 (kt).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER in Response to #17 Plaintiff SECURA Insurance Company's Notice for Request of Recusal of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/7/2021. (ALM)
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by SECURA Insurance Company (Taylor, David)
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Amended Memorandum) filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mattson, Timothy)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERNCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/15/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 01:30 PM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deere & Company.(Mattson, Timothy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Deere & Company.(Mattson, Timothy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Timothy J. Mattson in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Mattson, Timothy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mattson, Timothy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (Mattson, Timothy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Mattson, Timothy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Deere & Company. (Mattson, Timothy)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan McCarthy on behalf of Deere & Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J Mattson on behalf of Deere & Company. (Mattson, Timothy)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance Company. Deere & Company served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Taylor, David)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deere & Company. (MMP)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1198 (MJD/HB). (MMP)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deere & Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8745036) filed by SECURA Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURA Insurance Company v. Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Ryan McCarthy
Represented By: Timothy J Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURA Insurance Company
Represented By: David J Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURA Insurance Company as subrogee of Lance Goettl doing business as TLG Farm Partnership
Represented By: David J Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?