Wolch v. Xtratyme Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Wolch
Defendant: Xtratyme Technologies Inc. and Kyle Ackerman
Case Number: 0:2021cv01203
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR 90-DAY STAY. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/14/2021.(JLB)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Regan, Anne)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION for 90-Day Stay of Proceedings by Kyle Ackerman, Xtratyme Technologies Inc.. Jointly Signed by Jesse Wolch. (Regan, Anne)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Kyle Ackerman answer due 6/14/2021; Xtratyme Technologies Inc. answer due 6/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/3/2021.(JLB)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Regan, Anne)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kyle Ackerman, Xtratyme Technologies Inc.. Jointly Signed by Jesse Wolch. (Regan, Anne)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesse Wolch. Xtratyme Technologies Inc. served on 5/13/2021, answer due 06/03/2021. (Hansen, Adam) Modified text on 5/25/2021 (lmb).
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kyle Ackerman, Xtratyme Technologies Inc. (lmb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1203 (WMW/LIB). (lmb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xtratyme Technologies Inc., Kyle Ackerman (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8745959) filed by Jesse Wolch. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hansen, Adam) Modified text on 5/12/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolch v. Xtratyme Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtratyme Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Joseph M Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Ackerman
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Joseph M Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Wolch
Represented By: Adam W Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?