Olmsted Medical Center v. Continental Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Olmsted Medical Center
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01309
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 7/22/2021. (MSK) Modified text on 7/23/2021 (MSK).
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Continental Casualty Company. filed by Olmsted Medical Center. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Yetka, Christopher)
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Defendant (Woodworth, Amy)
July 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Vaccaro on behalf of Continental Casualty Company. (Vaccaro, Robert)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/8/2021.(MSK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Yetka, Christopher)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Olmsted Medical Center. Jointly Signed by Continental Casualty Company. (Yetka, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #8 Letter to Magistrate Judge. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Letter Request and finds good cause to reschedule the Rule 16 conference and to delay the entry of a scheduling order. However, instead of holding a Rule 16 Conference, the Court will hold a status conference on July 22, 2021, at 1:00 PM. Chambers will provide call-in instructions. The parties are not required to file a Rule 26(f) report or the confidential settlement letters requested by the Order for Pretrial Conference at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/22/2021.(MSK)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Continental Casualty Company re: Stay of Pre-Trial Conference. (Woodworth, Amy)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #4 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/9/2021.(MSK)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation. (Woodworth, Amy)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Continental Casualty Company. Jointly Signed by Olmsted Medical Center. (Woodworth, Amy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-1309 MJD/BRT. (MMG)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Continental Casualty Company. (Woodworth, Amy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Olmsted County District Court, case number 55-CV-21-2869 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8789349) filed by Continental Casualty Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Affidavits of Service, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woodworth, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olmsted Medical Center v. Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Louise A Behrendt
Represented By: Amy J Woodworth
Represented By: Julia J Nierengarten
Represented By: Robert William Vaccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olmsted Medical Center
Represented By: Sarah DeWitt Greening
Represented By: Christopher H Yetka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?