Olson v. Amazon.com Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron Olson
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv01350
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Aaron Olson is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Aaron Olson has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2021. Fact Discovery due by 3/15/2022. Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 3/15/2022. Motions (disp) due by 5/16/2022. Ready for trial due by 9/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/15/2021. (KAT)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 9/13/2021 at 02:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/15/2021. (KAT)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/15/2021. The Court granted Mr. Olson permission to electronically submit the form requesting permission to file documents electronically in this case. See Minutes for further details. (KAT)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Amazon.com Inc.. Jointly Signed by Aaron Olson.(Urena, Charles)
June 22, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #8 . Mail not re-sent to Aaron Olson. Address failed at 114 5th St. SE, #502, Minneapolis, MN 55414. Marked as Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. No further contact information for Plaintiff, address marked unknown. (MMG) Modified file date on 6/23/2021 (MMG). Document QCd on 7/21/2021 (MMG).
June 15, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable 5 NEF of Practice Pointers and WMW's Practice Pointers sent to Aaron Olson at 114th St SE, #502 Minneapolis, MN 55414. Re-mailed to Aaron Olson at updated address: 114 5th St, SE #502, Minneapolis, MN 55414. (MMP)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES: Instructions for Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 9:00 AM. (KAT)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been sent to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Urena, Charles)
June 11, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable 5 . Mail sent to Aaron Olson at 114th St. SE, Apt. 502, Minneapolis, MN 55414 returned as undeliverable. Per the summons exhibit A of the Notice of Removal updated address to 114 5th St., S.E., Apt. 502, Minneapolis, MN 55414 and resent mail. (MKB) Qc'd on 7/18/2021 (KNK).
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1350 (WMW/KMM). (MKB)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McNee, Emily)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin, case number 27-CV-21-4062 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8803024) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Emily McNee, #3 Complaint and Summons, #4 Exhibit(s) B Declaration of Emily McNee, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service) (McNee, Emily) Modified text on 6/8/2021 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Amazon.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Represented By: Charles Urena
Represented By: Emily A McNee
Represented By: Michael G Congiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?