Prager v.Allina Health et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Prager and Jeffrey J. Prager, I
Defendant: Dr. Ramsey Peterson, Allina Health and Ms. Kathy Burville
Case Number: 0:2021cv01351
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER/NOTICE - The Motion before the Court is now fully briefed. The Court will rule on the Motion based on the parties' submissions without oral argument. Ordered by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/15/2021.(las)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Allina Health, Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olson, Daniel)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Allina Health, Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson.(Olson, Daniel)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Allina Health, Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson.(Olson, Daniel)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jeffrey J. Prager, I.(MMP) Document QC'd on 7/14/2021 (KDS).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/17/2021. (TMA)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jeffrey J. Prager, I re #15 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet-Non Family, #14 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #12 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (MMP) Document QC'd on 7/13/2021 (CLK).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXHIBIT -State of Minnesota Hennepin County Superior Court - Summons filed by Jeffrey J. Prager, I.(MMP) Document QC'd on 7/13/2021 (CLK).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE (this order is blank with with exception of a signature line for Judge of Superior Court of Hennepin County, Minnesota) filed by Jeffrey Prager. (MMP) Document QC'd on 7/13/2021 (CLK).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jeffrey J. Prager, I.(MMP) Document QC'd on 7/13/2021 (CLK).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jeffrey J. Prager, I. (MMP) Document QC'd on 7/13/2021 (CLK).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET (NON-FAMILY CASE TYPE) filed by Jeffrey J. Prager, I (MMP) Document QC'd on 7/13/2021 (CLK).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Jeffrey J. Prager is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Jeffrey J. Prager has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (NAH)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allina Health, Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Olson, Daniel)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #5 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Olson, Daniel)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Allina Health, Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olson, Daniel)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Olson, Daniel)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Allina Health, Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson. (Olson, Daniel)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Rights Housing/Accomodations ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1351 (DWF/ECW). (MMP)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLINA HEALTH, Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Olson, Daniel)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants ALLINA HEALTH, Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson. (Olson, Daniel)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8804147) filed by Kathy Burville, Ramsey Peterson, Allina Health. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint , #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Service #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Daniel) Modified text on 6/8/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prager v.Allina Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Prager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Prager, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ramsey Peterson
Represented By: Gillian Gilbert
Represented By: Daniel R Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allina Health
Represented By: Gillian Gilbert
Represented By: Daniel R Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Kathy Burville
Represented By: Gillian Gilbert
Represented By: Daniel R Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?