Duffek v. iMedia Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laura Duffek
Defendant: iMedia Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv01413
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK) Modified text on 7/29/2021 (MSK).
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by iMedia Brands, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Hermon for iMedia Brands, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/23/2021. (NAH)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James F. Hermon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8827892 filed by iMedia Brands, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to iMedia Brands, Inc. (CLK)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-1413 ECT/BRT. (CLK)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against iMedia Brands, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8821110) filed by Laura Duffek. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Black, Bert)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED AT #2 . COMPLAINT against iMedia Brands, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8821034) filed by Laura Duffek. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Black, Bert) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffek v. iMedia Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iMedia Brands, Inc.
Represented By: James Hermon
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Duffek
Represented By: Lauren Allison D'Cruz
Represented By: Bert Black
Represented By: Makenzie L. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?