Radisson Hotels International, Inc. v. Ronit Hospitality, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Radisson Hotels International, Inc.
Defendant: Meera Inc., Ronit Hospitality, LLC and Meera, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv01414
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brett French for Meera, LLC and for Ronit Hospitality, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/4/2021. (JGK)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
July 29, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brett D. French. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8919865 filed by Meera, LLC, Ronit Hospitality, LLC. (Hansen, Erik)
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Meera, LLC, Ronit Hospitality, LLC. (Hansen, Erik)
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik F Hansen on behalf of All Defendants. (Hansen, Erik)
July 9, 2021 Filing 14 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Brett D. French as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. cc: French. (MKB)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Meera, LLC answer due 7/29/2021; Ronit Hospitality, LLC answer due 7/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/9/2021. (DMM)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation,. (Miller, Craig)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #9 Amended Complaint, Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Ronit Hospitality, LLC and Meera, LLC. (Miller, Craig)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #9 Amended Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. (Miller, Craig)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Meera, LLC, Ronit Hospitality, LLC against Meera Inc., Ronit Hospitality, LLC. filed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E) (Miller, Craig)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. Meera Inc. served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Miller, Craig)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. Ronit Hospitality, LLC served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Miller, Craig)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Meera Inc., Ronit Hospitality, LLC. (KNK)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Maisa Jean Frank as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-1414 (WMW/BRT). (KNK)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. (Miller, Craig)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meera Inc., Ronit Hospitality, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8821237) filed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radisson Hotels International, Inc. v. Ronit Hospitality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meera Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronit Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Brett French
Represented By: Erik F Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meera, LLC
Represented By: Brett French
Represented By: Erik F Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radisson Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Craig P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?