New York Life Insurance Company v. DeGroot et al
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Seth DeGroot, Cole DeGroot and Mikaela Ritzman
Case Number: 0:2021cv01422
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) ORDER on #16 Stipulation.The Court is in receipt of the Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants Mikaela Ritzman and Seth DeGroot to Answer (Doc. No. 16). The Court is willing to consider an extension; however, the Court wants to better understand the stipulating parties' positions on the Interpleader Deposit. ( Doc. No. 5). Please supplement your stipulation by August 20, 2021 to include a joint proposal on how that motion should be addressed. Meanwhile, a short extension to Answer will be granted to give the parties time to supplement the stipulation to include a proposal on the handling of that motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including August 30, 2021, to file their Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/12/2021.(MSK)
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Lisle, Erin)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer by New York Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Mikaela Ritzman and Seth DeGroot. (Lisle, Erin)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #13 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/19/2021.(MSK)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation. (Lisle, Erin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer by New York Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Mikaela Ritzman and Seth DeGroot. (Lisle, Erin)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York Life Insurance Company. Seth DeGroot served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Berens, Barbara)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York Life Insurance Company. Mikaela Ritzman served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Berens, Barbara)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York Life Insurance Company. Cole DeGroot served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Berens, Barbara)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by New York Life Insurance Company re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by New York Life Insurance Company.(Berens, Barbara)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by New York Life Insurance Company.(Berens, Barbara)
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) : Date and time to be determined. (Berens, Barbara)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by New York Life Insurance Company.(Berens, Barbara)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Registry Deposit Information Form)(Berens, Barbara)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cole DeGroot, Seth DeGroot, Mikaela Ritzman. (KDS)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-1422 JRT/BRT. (KDS)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff New York Life Insurance Company. (Berens, Barbara)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Cole DeGroot, Seth DeGroot, Mikaela Ritzman (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8823220) filed by New York Life Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Berens, Barbara) Modified text on 6/17/2021 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Life Insurance Company v. DeGroot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth DeGroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole DeGroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikaela Ritzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin K Fogarty Lisle
Represented By: Carrie L Zochert
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?