Peterson v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Joan Servantez and Joan Peterson
Defendant: Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc, United States of America and Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv01431
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT on #5 Stipulation. Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc. answer due 9/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/12/2021.(JLB)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Sater, Jesse)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION Motion to Extend Time for Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc. to Answer to Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc.. Jointly Signed by Joan Peterson. (Sater, Jesse)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Friedrich A. P. Siekert on behalf of United States of America. (Siekert, Friedrich)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc., United States of America. (MMP)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1431 (MJD/LIB). (MMP)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8825437) filed by Joan Servantez. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Expert Review) (Storms, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc.
Represented By: Jesse E Sater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Servantez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Storms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Peterson
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Goehring
Represented By: Jeffrey S Storms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?