Levine v. Kijakazi et al
Plaintiff: Stewart Levine
Defendant: Abe Ross Levine, Andrew M. Saul, Truestone Financial Credit Union and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2021cv01443
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. A notice to withdraw consent has been filed in this case and is now assigned to Judge David S. Doty and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1443 DSD/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 MOTION Restore and Return Social Security Benefits and for Expedited Hearing re #4 Order to Show Cause filed by Stewart Levine, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Stewart Levine filed by Stewart Levine, #1 Complaint filed by Stewart Levine. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/30/2021. (TJB)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 EXHIBITS re #5 MOTION Restore and Return Social Security Benefits and for Expedited Hearing and Response to #4 Order to Show Cause filed by Stewart Levine.(MMP) Document QC'd on 7/21/2021 (MTP).
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION Restore and Return Social Security Benefits and for Expedited Hearing Response to #4 Order to Show Cause filed by Stewart Levine. (MMP) Document QC'd on 7/21/2021 (MTP).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause by 7/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/22/2021. (TJB)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 cc: Stewart Levine. (CLK) Modified text on 6/21/2021 (CLK).
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Stewart Levine. (CLK) Document QC'd on 7/15/2021 (MTP).
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abe Ross Levine, Andrew M. Saul, Truestone Financial Credit Union filed by Stewart Levine. Case assigned to Judge David T. Schultz per Civil (Social Security) list. (CLK) Document QC'd on 7/15/2021 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levine v. Kijakazi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abe Ross Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truestone Financial Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?