Phillips v. City of Minneapolis, The
Plaintiff: Ronald Lawrence Phillips
Defendant: City of Minneapolis, The
Case Number: 0:2021cv01463
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Lawrence Phillips. City of Minneapolis, The served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (CLK)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 (Text-Only) Notice to Parties: The clerk's office has prepared and sent the service packet to the U.S. Marshal Service to the City of Minneapolis for service of process per #9 Order. Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (kt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to City of Minneapolis, The. (kt)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/4/2021. (MSK)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT/ADDITIONAL FACTS re #7 MOTION FOR AN ORDER A AMERICAN DISABILITY ACT PAID FOR ENGLISH SPEAKING, READING AND WRITING AT THE UNITED STATE'S DISTRICT COURT LEVEL, HELP AS NEEDED filed by Ronald Lawrence Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Attachments)(CLK) Document QC'd on 7/29/2021 (MMG).
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION FOR AN ORDER A AMERICAN DISABILITY ACT PAID FOR ENGLISH SPEAKING, READING AND WRITING AT THE UNITED STATE'S DISTRICT COURT LEVEL, HELP AS NEEDED filed by Ronald Lawrence Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 7/29/2021 (MMG).
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 RECEIPT number 44641111168 in the amount of $402.00 issued to Ronald Phillips. (CLK) Qc'd on 7/18/2021 (KNK).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/23/2021. (MSK)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ronald Lawrence Phillips. (NAH)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Minneapolis, The filed by Ronald Lawrence Phillips. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Rights-Other ADA list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. City of Minneapolis, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lawrence Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minneapolis, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?