Thoen v. NewTeam LLC
Plaintiff: Jeremy Thoen
Defendant: NewTeam LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv01477
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Expert Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 5/15/2022. Motions (disp) due by 6/15/2022. Ready for trial due by 10/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/3/2021.(JLB)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Jeremy Thoen. (Ahlberg, Ryan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tessa A. Mansfield on behalf of NewTeam LLC. (Mansfield, Tessa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CASE as to NewTeam LLC. (Bachman, Lisa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by NewTeam LLC. Jointly Signed by Jeremy Thoen.(Bachman, Lisa)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Braden D. Ahlberg as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1477 ECT/LIB. (CLK)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by NewTeam LLC. (Bachman, Lisa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County, Second Judicial District, case number Not yet Assigned (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8837218) filed by NewTeam LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons & Complaint, #2DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Exhibit(s) B - Answer, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bachman, Lisa) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thoen v. NewTeam LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewTeam LLC
Represented By: Lisa Lamm Bachman
Represented By: Tessa A. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Thoen
Represented By: Ryan H Ahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?