Chmielewski et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Counter Defendant: Daystar Management Group, Inc. and Severin M. Chmielewski
Counter Claimant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01496
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 3/30/2022. Settlement Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/18/2021. (HAM)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 3/1/2022. Motions (disp) due by 6/1/2022. Ready for trial due by 9/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/18/2021. (HAM)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/18/2021. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Jointly Signed by Severin M. Chmielewski and Daystar Management Group, Inc..(Curtis, Kathleen)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/16/2021. (HAM)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-01496 JRT/TNL. (MTP)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #2 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, #3 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Curtis, Kathleen)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Curtis, Kathleen)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Severin M. Chmielewski, Daystar Management Group, Inc.. filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Amendment to Lease) (Curtis, Kathleen)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anoka County (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8844014) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Affidavit of Service of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Curtis, Kathleen) Modified text on 7/2/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chmielewski et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Daystar Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J Neaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Severin M. Chmielewski
Represented By: Patrick J Neaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Kathleen K Curtis
Represented By: C Todd Koebele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?