GFY Real Estate, LLC v. Myth Investors, LLC
Plaintiff: GFY Real Estate, LLC
Defendant: Myth Investors, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv01509
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2021. Fact Discovery due by 2/25/2022. Expert Discovery due by 4/22/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 3/11/2022. Motions (disp) due by 6/22/2022. Ready for trial due by 10/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/25/2021.(TMA)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/23/2021. (TMA)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by GFY Real Estate, LLC. Jointly Signed by Myth Investors, LLC.(Drewes, Jonathan)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/16/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (MTP).
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Myth Investors, LLC. (Thieroff, Mark)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GFY Real Estate, LLC. Myth Investors, LLC served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Drewes, Jonathan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Myth Investors, LLC. (lmb)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1509 (ECT/ECW). (lmb)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Myth Investors, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8850637) filed by GFY Real Estate, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Drewes, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GFY Real Estate, LLC v. Myth Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myth Investors, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Thieroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GFY Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan L R Drewes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?